MI HB5038 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; carrying certain firearms or pistols; allow under certain circumstances. Amends 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 - 28.435) by adding sec. 3.
Title
Weapons; firearms; carrying certain firearms or pistols; allow under certain circumstances. Amends 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.421 - 28.435) by adding sec. 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Kate Ebli [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-06-16 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-16 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 299 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-16 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-16 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-16 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-16 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-06-16 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-06-04 | Printed Bill Filed 06/04/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-06-03 | Read A First Time | |
2009-06-03 | Introduced By Representative Kate Ebli |