MI HB5030 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Pending: Senate Housing And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Housing: housing development authority; note and bond purchase for cancellation; modify. Amends sec. 30 of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1430).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing: housing development authority; note and bond purchase for cancellation; modify. Amends sec. 30 of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1430).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13SenateReferred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
2024-06-12HouseTransmitted
2024-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 59 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2024-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-11HouseRead A Second Time
2024-04-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-04-23HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2023-09-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/20/2023
2023-09-20HouseReferred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business
2023-09-20HouseRead A First Time
2023-09-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Betsy Coffia

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-5030
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-5030.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-5030.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5030-2690B366.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5030-7118CF3F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5030-4ADBB7EE.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5030-CE3C55F6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-04-23-033.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-12-053.htm

Bill Comments

feedback