MI HB5029 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 231'15 With Immediate Effect 2015 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 231'15 With Immediate Effect 2015 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; other; electronic access to courts; allow. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding secs. 1986 & 1987. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5028'15, HB 5030'15, SB 0531'15, SB 0532'15, SB 0533'15
Title
Courts; other; electronic access to courts; allow. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding secs. 1986 & 1987. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5028'15, HB 5030'15, SB 0531'15, SB 0532'15, SB 0533'15
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 498 (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 (Y: 93 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 231'15 With Immediate Effect 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2015 @ 3:18 Pm 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2015 @ 10:38 Am 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2015 @ 11:48 Am 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-12-16 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 498 Yeas 93 Nays 13 |
2015-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 591 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2015-12-02 | House | Title Amended |
2015-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 Yeas 93 Nays 13 |
2015-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-12-01 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2015-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-10-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/29/2015 |
2015-10-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |