MI HB5018 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 528'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of cyberbullying; enact. Amends sec. 16t, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16t).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of cyberbullying; enact. Amends sec. 16t, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16t).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 899 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 817 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 193 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 528'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:06 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:29 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:14 Pm
2018-12-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-19HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-12-19House Roll Call # 899 Yeas 92 Nays 17
2018-12-19HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-18HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-12-18HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2018-12-13SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 817 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-12-13SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-13SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-12-13SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-05-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-05-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-30SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-04-10SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-03-22HouseTransmitted
2018-03-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 193 Yeas 92 Nays 17
2018-03-22HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-03-21HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-09-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/27/2017
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-09-27HouseRead A First Time
2017-09-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5018
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5018.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5018.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5018.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5018.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-27-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-22-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-30-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-13-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-12-19-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback