MI HB5017 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - Assigned Pa 457'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; other; cyberbullying; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.568) by adding sec. 411x.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; other; cyberbullying; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.568) by adding sec. 411x.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 191 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28HouseAssigned Pa 457'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2018 @ 3:44 Pm
2018-12-28HouseApproved By The Governor 12/24/2018 @ 11:09 Am
2018-12-20HousePresented To The Governor 12/20/2018 @ 3:02 Pm
2018-12-18HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-18HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-12-18HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-12-13SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 816 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-12-13SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-13SenateRules Suspended
2018-12-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-12-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-05-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-05-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-04-10SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-03-22HouseTransmitted
2018-03-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 191 Yeas 91 Nays 17
2018-03-22HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-03-21HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-09-28HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/27/2017
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-09-27HouseRead A First Time
2017-09-27HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5017
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5017.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5017.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5017.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5017.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0457.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-27-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-22-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-30-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-13-079.htm

Bill Comments

feedback