MI HB5015 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-28 - Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer protection; unfair trade practices; disclosure requirement for certain veterans' benefit services; establish. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 331 (MCL 445.903) & adds sec. 3l.
Title
Consumer protection; unfair trade practices; disclosure requirement for certain veterans' benefit services; establish. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 331 (MCL 445.903) & adds sec. 3l.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 395 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2017-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-09 | House | Title Amended |
2017-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 395 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-09-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/27/2017 |
2017-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2017-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Wentworth |
Subjects
Consumer protection: marketing and advertising
Consumer protection: unfair trade practices
Retirement: other
Veterans: other
Consumer protection: unfair trade practices
Retirement: other
Veterans: other