MI HB5002 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 270'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 270'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: fishing; purchase of all-species fishing license by individuals under 17 years of age; exempt from additional charges. Amends sec. 43532a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43532a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5003'19
Title
Natural resources: fishing; purchase of all-species fishing license by individuals under 17 years of age; exempt from additional charges. Amends sec. 43532a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.43532a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5003'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 495 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 270'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:12 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:22 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 06:39 Pm |
2020-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 495 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2020-01-22 | House | Transmitted |
2020-01-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 29 Yeas 101 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-01-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/24/2019 |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |