MI HB4997 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/16/2015 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/16/2015 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco; retail sales; sale of electronic cigarette or any oral device that provides vapor nicotine to minors; prohibit. Amends title & secs. 1, 2 & 4 of 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 et seq.).
Title
Tobacco; retail sales; sale of electronic cigarette or any oral device that provides vapor nicotine to minors; prohibit. Amends title & secs. 1, 2 & 4 of 1915 PA 31 (MCL 722.641 et seq.).
Sponsors
Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Rep. Paul Muxlow [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] | Rep. Thomas Hooker [R] |
Rep. Cindy Denby [R] | Rep. Bill Rogers [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Rep. Robert Genetski [R] |
Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Rep. Dave Pagel [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] |
Rep. Earl Poleski [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Rep. John Walsh [R] |
Sen. Margaret O'Brien [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 01/16/2015 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/2/2015 @ 11:50 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-11-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-09-18 | House | Postponed For The Day |
2014-09-18 | House | Senate Requests Return |
2014-09-18 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Senate Requests Return |
2014-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 501 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-08 | House | Title Amended |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 Yeas 94 Nays 15 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-07 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2014-05-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2013-09-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/20/2013 |
2013-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-09-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Rick Outman |