MI HB4994 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Assigned Pa 58'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Trade: business practices; donation of unclaimed shoes by persons engaged in the business of shoe repair; allow. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trade: business practices; donation of unclaimed shoes by persons engaged in the business of shoe repair; allow. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 101 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 (Y: 102 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24HouseAssigned Pa 58'22 With Immediate Effect
2022-03-24HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 04/07/2022 02:54 Pm
2022-03-24HouseApproved By The Governor 04/07/2022 12:04 Pm
2022-04-12HousePresented To The Governor 03/28/2022 01:40 Pm
2022-03-23HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2022-03-23HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2022-03-23SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 101 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2022-03-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2022-03-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2022-03-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2022-03-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2022-03-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2022-02-08SenateReferred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
2022-02-01HouseTransmitted
2022-02-01HouseTitle Amended
2022-02-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 102 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2022-02-01HouseRead A Third Time
2022-01-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2022-01-27HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2022-01-27HouseAmendment(s) Not Adopted
2022-01-27HouseRead A Second Time
2021-12-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-12-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2021-06-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/15/2021
2021-06-15HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2021-06-15HouseRead A First Time
2021-06-15HouseIntroduced By Representative Angela Witwer

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4994
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4994.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4994.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4994.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4994.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2022-PA-0058.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4994-0O339.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4994-421ED2D8.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4994-683E9E8D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4994-C194E994.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4994-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4994-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4994-07BB0272.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-07-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-02-01-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-22-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-23-030.htm

Bill Comments

feedback