MI HB4990 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-03 - Assigned Pa 129'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles: registration plates; sunset on registration tax; eliminate. Amends secs. 208b, 217a, 232, 801, 802, 803b, 803r, 804, 806 & 809 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.208b et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: registration plates; sunset on registration tax; eliminate. Amends secs. 208b, 217a, 232, 801, 802, 803b, 803r, 804, 806 & 809 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.208b et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 (Y: 56 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-03HouseAssigned Pa 129'23 With Immediate Effect
2023-10-03HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 09/29/2023 01:16 Pm
2023-10-03HouseApproved By The Governor 09/29/2023 11:18 Am
2023-09-28HousePresented To The Governor 09/28/2023 05:08 Pm
2023-09-27HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2023-09-27HouseFull Title Agreed To
2023-09-27HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2023-09-27SenateInserted Full Title
2023-09-27SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 481 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-09-26SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2023-09-26SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2023-09-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-09-26SenateRules Suspended
2023-09-20HouseTransmitted
2023-09-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-09-20HouseRead A Third Time
2023-09-20HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2023-09-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-09-20HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2023-09-20HouseRead A Second Time
2023-09-20HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-09-20HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2023-09-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2023
2023-09-14HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2023-09-14HouseRead A First Time
2023-09-14HouseIntroduced By Representative Felicia Brabec

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-4990
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4990.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-4990.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBS-4990.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/House/htm/2023-HNB-4990.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2023-PA-0129.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4990-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4990-0O338.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4990-B3128A4B.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-4990-L.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-4990-E.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-09-20-075.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-09-27-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback