MI HB4990 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 656'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 656'18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; vehicles owned and operated for nonprofit food banks and food pantries; revise registration fees. Amends secs. 224 & 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.224 & 257.801).
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; vehicles owned and operated for nonprofit food banks and food pantries; revise registration fees. Amends secs. 224 & 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.224 & 257.801).
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 1012 (Y: 90 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1010 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 450 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1010 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 450 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 656'18 |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 7:04 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/28/2018 @ 5:31 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:52 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 1012 Yeas 90 Nays 17 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2018-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Title Amendment |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1010 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Adopted |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-06-05 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-05 | House | Title Amended |
2018-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 450 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-30 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-09-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/19/2017 |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-09-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Tommy Brann |