MI HB4983 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-19)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Assigned Pa 190'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: expunction; time period after certain events applicant must wait to petition to set aside a conviction; amend. Amends 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621 - 780.624) by adding sec. 1d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4980'19, HB 4981'19, HB 4982'19, HB 4984'19, HB 4985'19, HB 5120'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: expunction; time period after certain events applicant must wait to petition to set aside a conviction; amend. Amends 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621 - 780.624) by adding sec. 1d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4980'19, HB 4981'19, HB 4982'19, HB 4984'19, HB 4985'19, HB 5120'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-13HouseAssigned Pa 190'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-13HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/13/2020 11:24 Am
2020-10-13HouseApproved By The Governor 10/12/2020 01:56 Pm
2020-09-29HousePresented To The Governor 09/29/2020 03:38 Pm
2020-09-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-09-24HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2020-09-23SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 335 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-09-23SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-23SenateRules Suspended
2020-09-23SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-09-23SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-07-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-07-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-07-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-11-07SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-11-05HouseTransmitted
2019-11-05HouseTitle Amended
2019-11-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 102 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-11-05HouseRead A Third Time
2019-11-05HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-11-05HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-11-05HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-11-05HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-29HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-09-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/18/2019
2019-09-17HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-09-17HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Yousef Rabhi

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4983
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4983.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4983.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4983.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4983.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0190.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-29-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-11-05-105.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-07-22-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-23-072.htm

Bill Comments

feedback