MI HB4980 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Assigned Pa 75'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control: speed restrictions; drag racing; make prohibition of inapplicable to scramble area at Silver Lake State Park. Amends sec. 626a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.626a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control: speed restrictions; drag racing; make prohibition of inapplicable to scramble area at Silver Lake State Park. Amends sec. 626a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.626a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseAssigned Pa 75'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-07-21HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 07/29/2021 11:18 Am
2021-07-21HouseApproved By The Governor 07/29/2021 09:44 Am
2021-07-21HousePresented To The Governor 07/21/2021 03:20 Pm
2021-07-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-07-21HouseFull Title Agreed To
2021-07-21HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2021-07-15SenateInserted Full Title
2021-07-15SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 Yeas 28 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-07-15SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-07-15SenateRules Suspended
2021-07-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-07-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-07-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-07-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-07-15SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-06-30SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2021-06-24HouseTransmitted
2021-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 96 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2021-06-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-06-23HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-06-23HouseRead A Second Time
2021-06-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-06-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-06-15HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/10/2021
2021-06-10HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2021-06-10HouseRead A First Time
2021-06-10HouseIntroduced By Representative Scott Vansingel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4980
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4980.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4980.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4980.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4980.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0075.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4980-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4980-C03059F0.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4980-6794DE6D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4980-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4980-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-17-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-24-061.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-07-15-061.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback