MI HB4974 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims: rights; victim and witness privacy and safety act; modify. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 40b to ch. VII.
Title
Crime victims: rights; victim and witness privacy and safety act; modify. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 40b to ch. VII.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 569 (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 569 (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 569 Yeas 95 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2021-12-01 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2021 |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Tenisha Yancey |