MI HB4970 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
Pending: Senate Education And Career Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
Pending: Senate Education And Career Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: employees; certain requirements related to seizure awareness; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1179c.
Title
Education: employees; certain requirements related to seizure awareness; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1179c.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Helena Scott [D] | Rep. John Roth [R] | Rep. Tim Sneller [D] |
Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 619 (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-12-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 619 Yeas 85 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2021 |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |