MI HB4969 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Referred To Committee On Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement: peace officers; conservation officers to wear body cams while on patrol; require. Amends 1986 PA 109 (MCL 300.21 - 300.22) by adding sec. 1a.
Title
Law enforcement: peace officers; conservation officers to wear body cams while on patrol; require. Amends 1986 PA 109 (MCL 300.21 - 300.22) by adding sec. 1a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 21 (Y: 71 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2022-01-27 | House | Transmitted |
2022-01-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 21 Yeas 71 Nays 31 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-01-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-01-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2021 |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |
Subjects
Law enforcement: peace officers
Natural resources: other
Safety: other
State agencies (existing): natural resources
Natural resources: other
Safety: other
State agencies (existing): natural resources