MI HB4969 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Placed On Immediate Passage
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Placed On Immediate Passage
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; forests; tax exemption for certain forest property; provide for. Amends secs. 51102, 51103, 51108 & 51115 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.51102 et seq.) & adds pt. 514. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4970'11
Title
Natural resources; forests; tax exemption for certain forest property; provide for. Amends secs. 51102, 51103, 51108 & 51115 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.51102 et seq.) & adds pt. 514. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4970'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Reassigned To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-02-22 | House | Transmitted |
2012-02-22 | House | Title Amended |
2012-02-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 70 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2012-02-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-02-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-02-21 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2012-02-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-02-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2011-09-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/15/2011 |
2011-09-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2011-09-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Foster |