MI HB4965 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 152'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 152'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: funds; allocations for certain county road commission expenditures; modify. Amends secs. 11h, 12, 14 & 15 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.661h et seq.).
Title
Transportation: funds; allocations for certain county road commission expenditures; modify. Amends secs. 11h, 12, 14 & 15 of 1951 PA 51 (MCL 247.661h et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Wakeman [R] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Rep. Mike Mueller [R] | Rep. Aaron Miller [R] |
Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Luke Meerman [R] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Gary Eisen [R] |
Rep. Jason Sheppard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 283 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 206 (Y: 101 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 206 (Y: 101 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Assigned Pa 152'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/17/2020 11:32 Am |
2020-09-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/17/2020 10:17 Am |
2020-09-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/14/2020 01:47 Pm |
2020-09-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 283 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-05-19 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 206 Yeas 101 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-09-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/17/2019 |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Rodney Wakeman |