MI HB4963 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; other; monitoring and oversight of juveniles under the age of 18 placed under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections; require, and provide for certain reporting. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 1m to ch. IX.
Title
Corrections; other; monitoring and oversight of juveniles under the age of 18 placed under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections; require, and provide for certain reporting. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding sec. 1m to ch. IX.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 201 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed Roll Call # 201 Yeas 97 Nays 12 |
2016-04-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Amended |
2016-04-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/08/2015 |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-10-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Kosowski |