MI HB4960 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Assigned Pa 89'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Assigned Pa 89'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles: wreckers; requirement for towed vehicle information to be put into the LEIN system within 24 hours of initiated tow; provide for. Amends secs. 252d & 252e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.252d & 257.252e).
Title
Vehicles: wreckers; requirement for towed vehicle information to be put into the LEIN system within 24 hours of initiated tow; provide for. Amends secs. 252d & 252e of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.252d & 257.252e).
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Fink [R] | Rep. Ronnie Peterson [D] | Sen. John Damoose [R] | Rep. Andrew Beeler [R] |
Rep. Matthew Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 (Y: 102 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | House | Assigned Pa 89'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/26/2022 01:44 Pm |
2022-06-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/26/2022 10:58 Am |
2022-05-19 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/19/2022 04:51 Pm |
2022-05-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-05-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-05-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 234 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 582 Yeas 102 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-02 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-06-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/03/2021 |
2021-06-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-06-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrew Fink |