MI HB4940 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 9'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 9'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agriculture; associations and commissions; dry bean act; modify apportionment of districts and create a member at large. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4 of 1965 PA 114 (MCL 290.551 et seq.).
Title
Agriculture; associations and commissions; dry bean act; modify apportionment of districts and create a member at large. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3 & 4 of 1965 PA 114 (MCL 290.551 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 4 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Pa 9'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/26/2018 @ 2:12 Pm |
2018-01-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/26/2018 @ 1:02 Pm |
2018-01-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/18/2018 @ 10:50 Am |
2018-01-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 4 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-10-19 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/13/2017 |
2017-09-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-09-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Edward Canfield |
Subjects
Agriculture: associations and commissions
Agriculture: products
State agencies (existing): agriculture and rural development
Agriculture: products
State agencies (existing): agriculture and rural development