MI HB4937 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: credits; make it in Michigan credit for taxpayers that make qualified student loan payments on behalf of qualified employees who are graduates of this state; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding sec. 677. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4933'23, HB 4936'23
Title
Corporate income tax: credits; make it in Michigan credit for taxpayers that make qualified student loan payments on behalf of qualified employees who are graduates of this state; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.847) by adding sec. 677. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4933'23, HB 4936'23
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Higher Education |
2023-09-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/05/2023 |
2023-09-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-09-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-09-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Jasper Martus |
Same As/Similar To
HB4933 (Same As) 2023-08-24 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/23/2023
HB4936 (Same As) 2023-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Higher Education
HB4936 (Same As) 2023-10-18 - Referred To Committee On Higher Education
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-4937 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4937.htm |