MI HB4936 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 437'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 437'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of US-127; designate as the "Tim Sanborn Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 83.
Title
Highways; name; portion of US-127; designate as the "Tim Sanborn Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 83.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 792 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 437'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 3:58 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:28 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 1:50 Pm |
2014-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 792 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2014-03-27 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 178 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2014-03-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-09-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/28/2013 |
2013-08-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2013-08-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-08-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Leonard |