MI HB4927 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; gambling; internet gaming; allow. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 310d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4926'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; gambling; internet gaming; allow. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 310d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4926'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 552 (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseTransmitted
2018-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 552 Yeas 68 Nays 40
2018-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-06-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-06-12HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-13HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-09-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/12/2017
2017-09-12HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2017-09-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-09-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback