MI HB4922 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-28 - Assigned Pa 123'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-28 - Assigned Pa 123'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; Michigan economic growth authority; the number of credits on regular and high-tech retention MEGAs; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 1995 PA 24 (MCL 207.808). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0070'09, SB 0071'09, SB 0774'09
Title
Economic development; Michigan economic growth authority; the number of credits on regular and high-tech retention MEGAs; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 1995 PA 24 (MCL 207.808). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0070'09, SB 0071'09, SB 0774'09
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Clemente [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-28 | Assigned Pa 123'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-28 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/27/2009 @ 8:41 Am | |
2009-10-28 | Approved By The Governor 10/27/2009 @ 7:25 Am | |
2009-10-27 | Presented To The Governor 10/23/2009 @ 11:29 Am | |
2009-10-22 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-10-22 | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-8 | |
2009-10-22 | Roll Call # 551 Yeas 30 Nays 4 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-10-22 | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-8 Concurred In | |
2009-10-22 | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-8 | |
2009-10-21 | Retransmitted | |
2009-10-21 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-10-21 | Roll Call # 505 Yeas 93 Nays 11 | |
2009-10-21 | Senate Substitute S-8 Concurred In As Amended | |
2009-10-21 | Amended | |
2009-10-15 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-10-15 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-8 With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2009-10-15 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-10-15 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 538 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-10-15 | Substitute S-8 Adopted | |
2009-10-15 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-10-15 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-10-15 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | |
2009-10-15 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-10-15 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | |
2009-10-15 | Discharge Committee Approved | |
2009-08-27 | Discharge Committee Defeated | |
2009-06-16 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2009-06-10 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 92 Nays 15 | |
2009-06-10 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-10 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-10 | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-06-10 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-05-20 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-05-20 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-05-13 | Printed Bill Filed 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2009-05-12 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-12 | Introduced By Representative Ed Clemente |