MI HB4920 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Legislature: legislative agencies; public disclosure of certain reports on sexual harassment claims made against legislators; require. Amends 1846 RS 2 (MCL 4.82 - 4.85) by adding sec. 2a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5281'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislature: legislative agencies; public disclosure of certain reports on sexual harassment claims made against legislators; require. Amends 1846 RS 2 (MCL 4.82 - 4.85) by adding sec. 2a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5281'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-04SenateReferred To Committee On Oversight
2021-11-03HouseTransmitted
2021-11-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2021-11-03HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-02HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-11-02HouseRead A Second Time
2021-10-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-10-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-05-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2021
2021-05-25HouseReferred To Committee On Oversight
2021-05-25HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-25HouseIntroduced By Representative Steven Johnson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4920
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4920.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4920.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4920-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4920-F6959501.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4920-FB4CFAB5.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4920-3704F6D9.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-14-084.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-03-092.htm

Bill Comments

feedback