MI HB4912 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture And Bioeconomy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Referred To Committee On Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture And Bioeconomy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: veterinarians; veterinarian-client-patient relationship; require and provide for other amendments to the regulation of veterinary medicine. Amends secs. 16215, 16283, 16286, 16287, 16288, 18802, 18805, 18811, 18812 & 18814 of 1978 PA 368 (MCLO 333.16215 et seq.); adds secs. 18811a, 18818, 18819 & 18829 & repeals sec. 16284 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16284).
Title
Health occupations: veterinarians; veterinarian-client-patient relationship; require and provide for other amendments to the regulation of veterinary medicine. Amends secs. 16215, 16283, 16286, 16287, 16288, 18802, 18805, 18811, 18812 & 18814 of 1978 PA 368 (MCLO 333.16215 et seq.); adds secs. 18811a, 18818, 18819 & 18829 & repeals sec. 16284 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16284).
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] | Rep. Julie Brixie [D] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] | Rep. Brad Paquette [R] |
Rep. Mary Whiteford [R] | Rep. Karen Whitsett [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 127 (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-17 | House | Title Amended |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 127 Yeas 85 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-03-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) |
2021-07-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2021 |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2021-05-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Robert Bezotte |