MI HB4910 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-7)
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Probate: guardians and conservators; duties of guardians, conservators, and guardians ad litem; modify. Amends secs. 5305, 5314, 5406, 5417 & 5418 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5305 et seq.) & adds sec. 5314a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4909'23, HB 4911'23, HB 4912'23, HB 5047'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate: guardians and conservators; duties of guardians, conservators, and guardians ad litem; modify. Amends secs. 5305, 5314, 5406, 5417 & 5418 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5305 et seq.) & adds sec. 5314a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4909'23, HB 4911'23, HB 4912'23, HB 5047'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25SenateReferred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
2023-10-24HouseTransmitted
2023-10-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 396 Yeas 89 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2023-10-24HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2023-10-24HouseRead A Third Time
2023-10-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-10-19HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2023-10-19HouseRead A Second Time
2023-10-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-10-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-07-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/18/2023
2023-07-18HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2023-07-18HouseRead A First Time
2023-07-18HouseIntroduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou

Same As/Similar To

HB4909 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
HB4911 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
HB4912 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
HB5047 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-4910
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4910.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-4910.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4910-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4910-0O338.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4910-0O3311.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4909-4632459A.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4909-6E57B87D.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-4909-L.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-10-11-083.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-10-24-088.htm

Bill Comments

feedback