MI HB4910 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Animals: other; prescription of and requests for reasonable accommodation for emotional support animals; regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4911'19
Title
Animals: other; prescription of and requests for reasonable accommodation for emotional support animals; regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4911'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 647 (Y: 66 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 594 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 594 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/30/2020 |
2020-12-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 06:55 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 647 Yeas 66 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-12-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 594 Yeas 23 Nays 14 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-03-17 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-17 | House | Rep. Sheryl Kennedy Removed As Cosponsor |
2020-03-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 59 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 18 |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Substitute (h-3) Not Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2019 |
2019-09-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-09-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Hall |