MI HB4897 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-14 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: challengers; election challengers designated to a city or township clerk’s office or satellite office on election day; authorize. Amends secs. 730, 731 & 733 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.730 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: challengers; election challengers designated to a city or township clerk’s office or satellite office on election day; authorize. Amends secs. 730, 731 & 733 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.730 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-09-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-05-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2021
2021-05-25HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2021-05-25HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-25HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Calley

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback