MI HB4893 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Bill Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental protection; solid waste; solid waste surcharge; extend sunset. Amends sec. 11525a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11525a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental protection; solid waste; solid waste surcharge; extend sunset. Amends sec. 11525a of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11525a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-09-19HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-09-19HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-09-19SenateInserted Full Title
2019-09-19SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-09-19SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-09-19SenateRules Suspended
2019-09-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-09-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-09-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-09-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-09-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-09-12SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-09-11HouseTransmitted
2019-09-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 206 Yeas 108 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-09-11HouseRead A Third Time
2019-09-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-09-10HouseRead A Second Time
2019-09-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-09-04HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-09-04HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2019
2019-09-03HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-09-03HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-03HouseIntroduced By Representative Rachel Hood

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback