MI HB4886 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-17 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; juries; names and addresses of taxpayers; allow to be disclosed to jury boards for selecting jury pools. Amends sec. 28 of 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.28). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4885'09
Title
Courts; juries; names and addresses of taxpayers; allow to be disclosed to jury boards for selecting jury pools. Amends sec. 28 of 1941 PA 122 (MCL 205.28). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4885'09
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-17 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-12-09 | Transmitted | |
2009-12-09 | Title Amended | |
2009-12-09 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 602 Yeas 66 Nays 42 | |
2009-12-09 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-12-09 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-09 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-12-09 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-12-09 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-12-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-01 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-06 | Printed Bill Filed 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-05-05 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-05 | Introduced By Representative David Nathan |