MI HB4881 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; violations; definition of clearly visible registration plate; clarify. Amends sec. 225 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.225).
Title
Traffic control; violations; definition of clearly visible registration plate; clarify. Amends sec. 225 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.225).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-09-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/16/2017 |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-08-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-08-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |