MI HB4880 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 47'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 47'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children: protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include physical therapist and physical therapist assistant. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Title
Children: protection; mandatory reporting requirements for child abuse or child neglect; expand to include physical therapist and physical therapist assistant. Amends sec. 3 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.623).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 94 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 542 (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 542 (Y: 101 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned Pa 47'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/23/2022 11:02 Am |
2022-03-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/23/2022 09:59 Am |
2022-03-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/21/2022 01:34 Pm |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 94 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 542 Yeas 101 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-05-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2021-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |
Subjects
Children: child abuse or child neglect
Children: protection
Health occupations: physical therapist assistants
Health occupations: physical therapists
Children: protection
Health occupations: physical therapist assistants
Health occupations: physical therapists