MI HB4876 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: election officials; election inspectors filing an affidavit indicating political party affiliation; require. Amends sec. 677 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.677).
Title
Elections: election officials; election inspectors filing an affidavit indicating political party affiliation; require. Amends sec. 677 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.677).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 (Y: 55 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2022-03-10 | House | Transmitted |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 Yeas 55 Nays 46 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-03-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-03-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-09-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |