MI HB4867 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; liability; liability of persons under equine activity liability act; limit to willful or wanton acts under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 5 of 1994 PA 351 (MCL 691.1665).
Title
Torts; liability; liability of persons under equine activity liability act; limit to willful or wanton acts under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 5 of 1994 PA 351 (MCL 691.1665).
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Daley [R] | Rep. Cindy Denby [R] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] | Rep. Ken Goike [R] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Kurtz [R] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Sen. Ricky Outman [R] |
Rep. Alton Pscholka [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Rep. Sharon Tyler [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 674 (Y: 65 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-05 | House | Passed Roll Call # 674 Yeas 65 Nays 41 |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-03-15 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture |
2011-08-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/27/2011 |
2011-07-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-07-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-07-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Joel Johnson |