MI HB4865 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-13 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for obtaining service or property by fraud or deception; enact. Amends sec. 16o, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16o) TIE BAR WITH: HB 4864'11
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for obtaining service or property by fraud or deception; enact. Amends sec. 16o, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16o) TIE BAR WITH: HB 4864'11
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Schmidt [D] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Paul Clemente [D] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] |
Rep. Frank Foster [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Commerce (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-03-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Commerce |
2011-08-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/27/2011 |
2011-07-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-07-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-07-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Roy Schmidt |