MI HB4861 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 131'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 131'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation: school vehicles; provision related to school bus drivers; update. Amends sec. 53 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1853).
Title
Transportation: school vehicles; provision related to school bus drivers; update. Amends sec. 53 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1853).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 131'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2021 04:30 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/16/2021 05:39 Pm |
2021-12-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/14/2021 09:52 Am |
2021-12-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-12-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-09-29 | House | Transmitted |
2021-09-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 443 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-09-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Jack O'malley |