MI HB4860 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; exotic; applicability of certain provisions of the large carnivore act based on residency; modify. Amends sec. 22 of 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1122).
Title
Animals; exotic; applicability of certain provisions of the large carnivore act based on residency; modify. Amends sec. 22 of 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1122).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-03 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/03/2019 |
2019-08-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2019-08-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-08-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4860 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4860.htm |