MI HB4856 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-17 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-17 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; other; local government charging for emergency and rescue services to rescue an individual during a state of emergency for grossly negligent conduct by that individual; provide for. Amends 1951 PA 33 (MCL 41.801 - 41.813) by adding sec. 6b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4857'13
Title
Local government; other; local government charging for emergency and rescue services to rescue an individual during a state of emergency for grossly negligent conduct by that individual; provide for. Amends 1951 PA 33 (MCL 41.801 - 41.813) by adding sec. 6b. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4857'13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-10-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2013-07-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/21/2013 |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2013-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandon Dillon |
Subjects
Health, emergency response
Health, emergency services
Local government, other
Local government, public services
Health, emergency services
Local government, other
Local government, public services