MI HB4855 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the crime of intentionally failing to document certain services in a medical record; enact. Amends sec. 13n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13n). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4858'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for the crime of intentionally failing to document certain services in a medical record; enact. Amends sec. 13n, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.13n). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4858'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 545 (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-11-10HouseTransmitted
2021-11-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 545 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
2021-11-10HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-09HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-09HouseRead A Second Time
2021-10-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-10-19HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-05-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021
2021-05-18HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2021-05-18HouseRead A First Time
2021-05-18HouseIntroduced By Representative Roger Hauck

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback