MI HB4853 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Assigned Pa 22'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Assigned Pa 22'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; motorcycles; fee for motorcycle safety course; modify. Amends sec. 811a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811a).
Title
Vehicles; motorcycles; fee for motorcycle safety course; modify. Amends sec. 811a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.811a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 419 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 419 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned Pa 22'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-02-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/23/2016 @ 4:12 Pm |
2016-02-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/23/2016 @ 8:27 Am |
2016-02-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/11/2016 @ 2:18 Pm |
2016-02-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-02-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-02-09 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2015-11-10 | House | Transmitted |
2015-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 419 Yeas 95 Nays 11 |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-11-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-11-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-09-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/10/2015 |
2015-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Tedder |