MI HB4848 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-21 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Probate: guardians and conservators; duties of guardians, conservators, and guardian ad litem; modify. Amends sec. 5305, 5314, 5406, 5417 & 5418 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5305 et seq.) & adds secs. 5314a, 5314b & 5314c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4847'21, HB 4849'21, HB 4850'21
Title
Probate: guardians and conservators; duties of guardians, conservators, and guardian ad litem; modify. Amends sec. 5305, 5314, 5406, 5417 & 5418 of 1998 PA 386 (MCL 700.5305 et seq.) & adds secs. 5314a, 5314b & 5314c. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4847'21, HB 4849'21, HB 4850'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Graham Filler |