MI HB4845 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: other; secretary of state to conduct signature verification training for local clerks; require. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding sec. 31b.
Title
Elections: other; secretary of state to conduct signature verification training for local clerks; require. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding sec. 31b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 362 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 362 Yeas 107 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |