MI HB4840 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-25 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-08-25 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: ballots; record retention period for election ballots; extend, and provide for record retention period for electronic poll book software. Amends secs. 811 & 847 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.811 & 168.847).
Title
Elections: ballots; record retention period for election ballots; extend, and provide for record retention period for electronic poll book software. Amends secs. 811 & 847 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.811 & 168.847).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 436 (Y: 80 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-08-17 | House | Transmitted |
2021-08-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 436 Yeas 80 Nays 28 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-08-17 | House | Amended |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-08-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-08-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-08-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/13/2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-05-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Borton |