MI HB4840 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control; speed restrictions; school zone speed limits; apply to limited access highway segment with a pedestrian overhead walkway. Amends sec. 627a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control; speed restrictions; school zone speed limits; apply to limited access highway segment with a pedestrian overhead walkway. Amends sec. 627a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.627a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation
2018-03-01HouseTransmitted
2018-03-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 120 Yeas 108 Nays 1
2018-03-01HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-28HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-02-28HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-06HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-08-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/12/2017
2017-07-12HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2017-07-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-07-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Tedder

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback