MI HB4834 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 46'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 46'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: exemptions; exemption for certain heavy equipment; provide for. Amends 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.1 - 211.155) by adding sec. 9p.
Title
Property tax: exemptions; exemption for certain heavy equipment; provide for. Amends 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.1 - 211.155) by adding sec. 9p.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tisdel [R] | Rep. Jim Ellison [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 122 (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 86 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 85 (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 557 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 86 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 85 (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 557 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned Pa 46'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/23/2022 11:00 Am |
2022-03-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/23/2022 09:57 Am |
2022-03-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/17/2022 10:30 Am |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-16 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 122 Yeas 100 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-03-16 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-03-16 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-03-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 86 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Return Granted |
2022-03-15 | House | Retransmitted |
2022-03-15 | House | Request Granted |
2022-03-15 | House | Vote On Concurring Reconsidered |
2022-03-15 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-03-15 | House | Enrollment Vacated |
2022-03-15 | House | Governor Returned Bill |
2022-03-15 | House | House Request Governor To Return Bill |
2022-03-15 | House | Senate Requests Return |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Requests Return |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-02 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 85 Yeas 99 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-03-01 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 47 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-10 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 557 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-05-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Mark Tisdel |