MI HB4834 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on August 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of performing dismemberment abortion; enact. Amends sec. 16d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4833'15
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crime of performing dismemberment abortion; enact. Amends sec. 16d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16d). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4833'15
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Rep. Earl Poleski [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] |
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] | Rep. Lee Chatfield [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] |
Rep. Larry Inman [R] | Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Sen. Michael Webber [R] | Rep. Triston Cole [R] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. James Tedder [R] | Rep. Ken Yonker [R] | Rep. Eric Leutheuser [R] |
Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Nancy Jenkins [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-08-20 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/20/2015 |
2015-08-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-08-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-08-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Laura Cox |
Subjects
Crimes: abortion
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Health occupations: physicians
Health: abortion
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines
Health occupations: physicians
Health: abortion