MI HB4832 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 100'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Assigned Pa 100'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-34; designate as the "Patrolman Bobby Lynn Williams Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 107.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-34; designate as the "Patrolman Bobby Lynn Williams Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 107.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Assigned Pa 100'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/04/2021 02:42 Pm |
2021-11-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/04/2021 09:34 Am |
2021-10-26 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/26/2021 09:48 Am |
2021-10-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-10-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 Yeas 109 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-05-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |