MI HB4832 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Presented To The Governor 02/21/2020 01:30 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Highways; memorial; portion of I-94; designate as the "Deputy Gate Keeper George W. Haight Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2083) by adding sec. 18b.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Highways; memorial; portion of I-94; designate as the "Deputy Gate Keeper George W. Haight Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2083) by adding sec. 18b.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 14 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HousePresented To The Governor 02/21/2020 01:30 Pm
2020-02-18HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-02-18HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-02-18HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2020-02-13SenateInserted Full Title
2020-02-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2020-02-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-02-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-01-23SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-01-23SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-01-23SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-01-15SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2020-01-14HouseTransmitted
2020-01-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 14 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-01-14HouseRead A Third Time
2020-01-08HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-01-08HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-12-03HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-08-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 08/28/2019
2019-08-28HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2019-08-28HouseRead A First Time
2019-08-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Sarah Lightner

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback